THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 9:05:19 AM
Koifman, Julius Yuli
CPSO#:
97708
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Aug 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Aug 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health System
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON M9V 1R8
Phone: 416-747-3400
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JULIUS YULI KOIFMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOIFMAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 06 Apr 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 07 Apr 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 06 Apr 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 07 Apr 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 06 Apr 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 07 Apr 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 06 Apr 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 07 Apr 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Aug 2017 |