THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 19:26:59 PM
Nadel, Maya
CPSO#:
97689
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jun 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1110 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 410
North York ON M2K 2W2
Phone: (416)-285-3323
Fax: (416)-285-1825
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:22 Jun 2015 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MAYA NADEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NADEL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Apr 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 May 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Apr 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Apr 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 May 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 2015 |