THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 1:11:05 AM
Khan, Mohammed Abdul Wahab
CPSO#:
97687
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Sep 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Sep 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
SUITE 302
345 Lakeshore Rd E
Oakville ON L6J 1J5
Phone: (905) 842-2888
Fax: (905) 842-5316
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Nova Scotia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation |
Effective:30 Jun 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MOHAMMED ABDUL WAHAB KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Sep 2017 |