THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 4:03:05 AM
Ambraska, Heather Katharina
CPSO#:
97681
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Dec 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Dec 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
West Parry Sound Health Centre
6 Albert Street
Parry Sound ON P2A 3A4
Phone: (705) 746-4540
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital |
Collingwood |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
West Parry Sound Health Centre |
Parry Sound |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:16 Dec 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HEATHER KATHARINA AMBRASKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMBRASKA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 28 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 19 Jan 2015 to 12 Apr 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Jul 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Dec 2014 |