THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 15:34:24 PM
Chase, Teena Darlene
CPSO#:
97672
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Aug 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Aug 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
402-2039 Robertson Rd
Nepean ON K2H 8R2
Phone: 613 927 9590
Fax: 613 703 7419
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:16 May 2019 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TEENA DARLENE CHASE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHASE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 27 Feb 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 Feb 2019 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Aug 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Aug 2019 |