THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 10:45:26 AM
Quadros, Kenneth
CPSO#:
97643
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
30 May 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Feb 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi
Education: Maharashtra University of Health Scien, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:18 Oct 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
AVP - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 26 Sep 2016 to 23 Oct 2016
EL - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 2017 to 28 Aug 2017
EL - Cardiology
McMaster University, 23 Oct 2017 to 19 Nov 2017
EL - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 11 Jun 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
EL - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Sep 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Oct 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Aug 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Oct 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 19 Nov 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Feb 2018 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 30 May 2023 |