THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 8:27:56 AM
Tsao, Miriam Wing San
CPSO#:
97627
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Jun 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Jun 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
210-400 Bronte St S
Milton ON L9T 0H7
Phone: 905 693 6606
Fax: 905 693 6906
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hos,pital |
Milton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
General Surgical Oncology |
Effective:23 Sep 2020 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MIRIAM WING SAN TSAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSAO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jun 2022 |