THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 0:34:29 AM
Tam, Benjamin Hoi-Lai
CPSO#:
97626
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
ICU
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System - Welland Site |
Welland |
Niagara Health System |
Niagara Falls |
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site |
St Catharines |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:27 Sep 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BENJAMIN HOI-LAI TAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Oct 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 28 Oct 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2016 |