THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 18:12:47 PM
Zavalishina, Yelena
CPSO#:
97623
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Sep 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Sep 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unison Health & Community Services
12 Flemington Road
Toronto, ON
M6A2N4
Toronto ON M4P 2H4
Phone: 416-787-1661
Fax: 416-787-3761
Electoral District: 10
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients should contact the clinic where they saw Dr. Zavalishina to request a copy of their medical record.
Date Received: 22 Mar 2018
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:18 Aug 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. YELENA ZAVALISHINA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAVALISHINA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 25 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 25 Aug 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2014 |