THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 12:35:26 PM
Alayed, Yasir Mohammed H
CPSO#:
97612
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
30 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Aug 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: King Saud University, Riyadh College of, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:30 Jun 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2012 to 31 Jul 2012
PEAP - R - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2019 |