THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 14:29:20 PM
Liederman, Zachary Harris
CPSO#:
97592
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
Blood Disorders Program
9NU993
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4069
Fax: 416-340-3799
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematology |
Effective:03 Nov 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ZACHARY HARRIS LIEDERMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIEDERMAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Sep 2019
CF - Hematology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2016 |