THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 6:11:04 AM
Corriveau, Nathalie
CPSO#:
97584
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McMaster University, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Dr
Barrie ON L4M 6M2
Phone: 705-728-9090 Ext. 47210
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre |
Barrie |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NATHALIE CORRIVEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CORRIVEAU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Jan 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 May 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 May 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2017 |