THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 23:02:46 PM
Anantharajah, Rokeni Sumi
CPSO#:
97576
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Oct 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Oct 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
108-1585 Markham Rd
Scarborough ON M1B 2W1
Phone: 416-299-6064
Fax: 416-299-1421
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:18 Jun 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROKENI SUMI ANANTHARAJAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANANTHARAJAH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Oct 2014 |