THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 6:49:00 AM
Shiga, Sarah Ann
CPSO#:
97527
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Jul 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Jul 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
190 Melrose Avenue
Ottawa ON K1Y 4K7
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 19222
Fax: (613) 761-4432
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SARAH ANN SHIGA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHIGA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 04 Jun 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
EL - Dermatology
Queen's University, 01 Sep 2014 to 30 Sep 2014
EL - Plastic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 19 Jan 2015 to 30 Jan 2015
EL - Plastic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jun 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jan 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jan 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jul 2016 |