THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 16:32:51 PM
Ahmed, Musawir
CPSO#:
97512
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of
23 Mar 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
28 Aug 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Johann Wolfgang Goethe Univ at Frankfurt, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Germany
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2012 to 23 Aug 2012
PEAP - CF - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 24 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 May 2014
CF - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 May 2015
CF - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Jul 2015
CF - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Jul 2016
CF - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 23 Mar 2018
CF - Respiratory Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Aug 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Aug 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 Aug 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Jul 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 28 Aug 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Mar 2018 |