THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 9:36:18 AM
Dar, Seema
CPSO#:
97505
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Nov 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
26 Nov 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: Ross University School of Medicine, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
41 Milner Ave
Scarborough ON M1S 3P6
Phone: 416-293-0275
Fax: 416-293-8057
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Pennsylvania
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:26 Nov 2013 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 28 May 2012 to 23 Jun 2012
EL - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 May 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 26 Nov 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Apr 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Apr 2015 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Apr 2015 |
|
Active |