THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 4:35:52 AM
Amanullah, Shabbir
CPSO#:
97496
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 May 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
10 May 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Malayalam, Tamil
Education: Mysore University, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
752 Kingstreet West
Providence Care Hospital
Kingston ON K7L 4X3
Phone: 6135444900
Electoral District: 06
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India
Northwest Territories
Prince Edward Island
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Providence Care Centre |
Kingston |
Woodstock Hospital |
Woodstock |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:16 Apr 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 10 May 2012 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 May 2012 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 09 May 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Feb 2015 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 03 Feb 2015 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Feb 2015 |
|
Active |