THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 8:23:05 AM
Tan, Michael Chung Yin
CPSO#:
97484
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Dec 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Dec 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Phone: 905-338-4651
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:05 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHAEL CHUNG YIN TAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 07 May 2012 to 03 Jun 2012
EL - Respirology
University of Toronto, 30 Jul 2012 to 24 Aug 2012
EL - Respiratory Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 21 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 May 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 03 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 24 Aug 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Sep 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Dec 2015 |