THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 15:12:27 PM
Promislow, Steven Joseph
CPSO#:
97460
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
05 May 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Aug 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Steven Promislow Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 11 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin St
Ottawa, ON K1Y 4W7
Date Received: 05 May 2021
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nunavut
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:16 Nov 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 08 May 2012 to 30 May 2012
EL - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 May 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 May 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Aug 2015 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 05 May 2021 |