THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 22:49:30 PM
Chawla, Aakriti
CPSO#:
97455
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Oct 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Oct 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi
Education: Bond University, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON L7G 2B8
Phone: (416) 534-5130
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Prince Edward Island
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital |
Georgetown |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:18 Jun 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AAKRITI CHAWLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAWLA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 02 May 2012 to 29 May 2012
EL - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 30 May 2012 to 22 Jun 2012
EL - Urology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 May 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2013 |