THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
17/04/24 16:29:00 PM
Shah, Archna Suryakant
CPSO#:
97440
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Apr 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Apr 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Glasgow School of Medicine, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
C H E O
Division of Emergency Medicine
401 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Phone: 613-737-7600
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Newfoundland and Labrador
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatric Emergency Medicine |
Effective:30 Sep 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Pediatrics |
Effective:16 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ARCHNA SURYAKANT SHAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 07 May 2012 to 02 Jun 2012
EL - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 24 Sep 2012 to 19 Oct 2012
EL - Pediatric Cardiology
University of Toronto, 26 Oct 2015 to 22 Nov 2015
EL - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 May 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 02 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 19 Oct 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Oct 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Nov 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Apr 2019 |