THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 3:48:54 AM
Okrainec, Karen
CPSO#:
97430
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Jun 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Jun 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
399 Bathurst Street
8 E Wing- 408
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5800 Ext. 2141
Fax: 416-603-6495
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KAREN OKRAINEC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OKRAINEC is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 16 Apr 2012 to 04 May 2012
EL - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 04 Jun 2012 to 29 Jun 2012
EL - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Apr 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 04 May 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jun 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jun 2012 |