THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 2:59:34 AM
Butler, Marcus Otho
CPSO#:
97421
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Apr 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
10 Apr 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Yale University, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
U H N Princess Margaret Cancer
Centre
Division of Medical Oncology
OPG 7-815 - 610 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-4501 Ext. 5485
Fax: (416) 946-6546
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:23 Jan 2020 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 10 Apr 2012 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Apr 2012 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Feb 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 May 2019 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Jan 2020 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Jan 2020 |
|
Active |