THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 10:17:39 AM
Chisick, Laura Beth
CPSO#:
97411
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
01 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Dec 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:31 Dec 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
General Internal Medicine |
Effective:21 Sep 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 05 Apr 2012 to 02 May 2012
EL - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2014 to 01 Jun 2015
EL - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Apr 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 02 May 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Dec 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2015 |