THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 7:28:02 AM
Chin, Lisa Ann-Marie
CPSO#:
97404
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
30 Apr 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
20 Apr 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: University of the West Indies, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 05 Apr 2012 to 18 Apr 2012
PEAP - R - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 19 Apr 2012 to 30 Apr 2012
EL - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 05 Apr 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Apr 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Apr 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Apr 2012 |