THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 1:34:43 AM
Allehebi, Riyad Omar N
CPSO#:
97401
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
16 Aug 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
12 Jun 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Umm Al-Qura University Faculty of Medici, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:31 Aug 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:19 Oct 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 04 Apr 2012 to 01 May 2012
EL - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jul 2013
EL - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Aug 2016
CF - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Aug 2017
CF - Respiratory Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Apr 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 May 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jul 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 12 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jun 2015 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 16 Aug 2018 |