THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 4:07:01 AM
Sharma, Anuja
CPSO#:
97380
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Mar 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
27 Mar 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi
Education: Gandhi Medical College, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
IM Care
1000 DePalma Drive
Cobourg ON K9A 5W6
Phone: (905) 377-7793
Fax: (905) 373-6969
Electoral District: 06
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Northumberland Hills Hospital |
Cobourg |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:27 Mar 2012 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 27 Mar 2012 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Mar 2012 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 26 Sep 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Oct 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Mar 2014 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 13 Mar 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 16 Apr 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Aug 2020 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Aug 2020 |
|
Active |