THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 15:00:25 PM
Davies, Simon Jonathan Cheshire
CPSO#:
97365
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Sep 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
20 Mar 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of London, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
C A M H
Geriatric Mental Health Program
PACE Clinic
80 Workman Way
Toronto ON M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 33448
Fax: (416) 583-1296
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site |
Toronto |
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:14 Jul 2017 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 20 Mar 2012 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Mar 2012 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 01 Mar 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Sep 2017 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 17 Sep 2018 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Sep 2018 |
|
Active |