THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 5:05:31 AM
Zhou, Alysia Weijia
CPSO#:
97364
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Aug 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Aug 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 8
65 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON K9V 5N7
Phone: (705) 324-9400
Fax: (705) 324-1944
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Northumberland Hills Hospital |
Cobourg |
Peterborough Regional Health Centre |
Peterborough |
Ross Memorial Hospital |
Lindsay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:30 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALYSIA WEIJIA ZHOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHOU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 19 Mar 2012 to 12 Apr 2012
EL - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 16 Sep 2013 to 26 Sep 2013
EL - Ophthalmology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 29 Oct 2013 to 22 Nov 2013
EL - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 Mar 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 12 Apr 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Sep 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 26 Sep 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Aug 2015 |