THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 22:39:30 PM
Alshehri, Saleh Abdullah S
CPSO#:
97335
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
28 Feb 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
25 May 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: King Khalid University College of Medici, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Mar 2012 to 24 May 2012
PEAP - CF - Cardiac Surgery
University of Ottawa, 25 May 2012 to 28 Feb 2013
CF - Cardiac Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 02 Mar 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 May 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Feb 2013 |