THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 1:20:42 AM
Ferenc, Aleksandra Monika
CPSO#:
97323
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Feb 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
27 Feb 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Polish
Education: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
KJK Healthplex
1100 Dundas St. W., Unit 4
Mississauga ON L5C 4E7
Phone: (416) 530-4966
Fax: (416) 530-4457
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:27 Feb 2012 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 27 Feb 2012 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Feb 2012 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 26 Aug 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 May 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Nov 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Jan 2016 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Jan 2016 |
|
Active |