THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 10:45:27 AM
Almaghlouth, Ibrahim Ali S
CPSO#:
97300
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
15 Aug 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Apr 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: King Saud University, Riyadh College of, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Saudi Arabia
USA - Pennsylvania
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Rheumatology |
Effective:24 Oct 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2012 to 27 Apr 2012
PEAP - R - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 28 Apr 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 15 Dec 2017
CF - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 16 Dec 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Rheumatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Apr 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Dec 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Feb 2018 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Apr 2018 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 15 Aug 2019 |