THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 7:45:20 AM
Khomani, Abderrahim
CPSO#:
97292
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Feb 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
15 Feb 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English, French, Russian
Education: St Petersburg State Pediatric Medical AC, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Gibbs Cancer Center & Research Inst
380 Serpentine Dr
Spartanburg SC 29303
United States
Phone: (864) 560-7050
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Massachusetts
USA - South Carolina
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:15 Feb 2012 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Feb 2012 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Feb 2012 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 14 Aug 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Apr 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Dec 2014 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 18 Dec 2014 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Dec 2014 |
|
Active |