THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 18:43:42 PM
Tripathi, Monika
CPSO#:
97267
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Sep 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
26 Sep 2023
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: Chhatrapati Shahuji Maharaj Medical Univ, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
36 Queen St E
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 360-4000
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:26 Sep 2023 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2012 to 10 Apr 2012
PEAP - CF - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 11 Apr 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 24 Apr 2013
CF - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 06 Feb 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Apr 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 24 Apr 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 26 Sep 2023 |
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Expiry Date: 25 Sep 2030 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Sep 2023 |
|
Active |