THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 11:02:10 AM
Elghobary, Tamer
CPSO#:
97264
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Sep 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Sep 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English, French
Education: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
76 Stuart St
Kingston General Hospital
Cardiac surgery Division
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Phone: 6135483232
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiac Surgery |
Effective:21 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TAMER ELGHOBARY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELGHOBARY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 20 Sep 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
CF - Cardiac Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
CF - Cardiac Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2023 to 19 Sep 2023
CF - Cardiac Surgery
Queen's University, 20 Sep 2023 to 31 Dec 2023
CF - Cardiac Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 Feb 2012 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Feb 2012 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 02 Feb 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Jul 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Feb 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Feb 2014 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Sep 2021 |