THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 8:07:36 AM
AlAhmadi, Saeed Mohmmad
CPSO#:
97263
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
30 Jun 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
06 Mar 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: University of Karachi, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2012 to 23 Mar 2012
PEAP - CF - Cardiology
McMaster University, 24 Mar 2012 to 28 Feb 2013
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 03 Feb 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Mar 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Mar 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Feb 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Mar 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2014 |