THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 1:40:28 AM
Au-Yeung, Daniel Hsueh Hsin
CPSO#:
97262
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
09 Mar 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
10 Feb 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: Queen's University, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 13 Feb 2012 to 11 Mar 2012
EL - Paediatric Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 06 May 2013 to 02 Jun 2013
EL - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 10 Feb 2014 to 09 Mar 2014
EL - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Feb 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Mar 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 May 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 02 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Feb 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 09 Mar 2014 |