THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 2:39:17 AM
Walton, Mark
CPSO#:
97261
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Feb 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Feb 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of London, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
First Nations Health Authority
PO Box 4000
4 Meno ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout ON P8T 1K2
Phone: (807) 737-5182
Electoral District: 09
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre |
Sioux Lookout |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:25 Jul 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARK WALTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALTON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2012 to 30 Dec 2012
CF - Family Medicine (Obstetrics)
University of Toronto, 20 Nov 2023 to 17 Dec 2023
CF - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
University of Toronto, 15 Jan 2024 to 11 Feb 2024
CF - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
University of Toronto, 12 Feb 2024 to 10 Mar 2024
CF - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Feb 2012 |