THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 20:34:40 PM
Bhasin, Sanchit
CPSO#:
97256
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
26 Aug 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Jul 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: Medical Academy of Silesia, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:03 Oct 2019 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:31 May 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 20 Feb 2012 to 11 Mar 2012
EL - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 30 Jul 2012 to 26 Aug 2012
EL - Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Feb 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Mar 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 26 Aug 2012 |