THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 5:18:46 AM
Ting, Yuk Joseph
CPSO#:
97237
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
30 Apr 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
28 Jan 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, Univers, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:12 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine |
Effective:21 Sep 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 06 Feb 2012 to 24 Feb 2012
EL - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 28 Jan 2013 to 30 Apr 2013
EL - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Feb 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 24 Feb 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 25 Jan 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jan 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Apr 2013 |