THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 19:19:39 PM
Jain, Vipul
CPSO#:
97236
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Sep 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
21 Sep 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: Kasturba Medical College, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Niagara Region Medical
8279 Lundy's Lane
Unit A3/A4
Niagara Falls ON L2H 1H5
Phone: (905) 357-1661
Fax: (905) 371-9090
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Clinical Immunology and Allergy |
Effective:15 Oct 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 13 Feb 2012 to 11 Mar 2012
EL - Infectious Diseases
McMaster University, 12 Mar 2012 to 08 Apr 2012
EL - Gastroenterology
McMaster University, 22 Oct 2012 to 18 Nov 2012
EL - Community Medicine
McMaster University, 06 May 2013 to 02 Jun 2013
EL - Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 30 Jul 2013 to 26 Aug 2013
EL - Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 21 Aug 2014 to 17 Sep 2014
EL - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 11 Feb 2016 to 06 Mar 2016
EL - Occupational Medicine
University of Toronto, 07 Mar 2016 to 03 Apr 2016
EL - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy
McMaster University, 04 Apr 2016 to 15 May 2016
EL - Dermatology
McMaster University, 16 May 2016 to 26 May 2016
EL - Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Feb 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 08 Apr 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Oct 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Nov 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 May 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 02 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jul 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 26 Aug 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Aug 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Sep 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Feb 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 26 May 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 21 Sep 2016 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Sep 2016 |
|
Active |