THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 16:21:50 PM
Une, Dai
CPSO#:
97230
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
30 Jun 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
19 Apr 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: Okayama Medical University, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 25 Jan 2012 to 18 Apr 2012
PEAP - CF - Cardiac Surgery
University of Ottawa, 19 Apr 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Cardiac Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Cardiac Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 03 Jan 2014
CF - Cardiac Surgery
University of Ottawa, 04 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Cardiac Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jan 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 Apr 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2014 |