THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 23:24:15 PM
Hansen, Aaron Richard
CPSO#:
97229
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
09 Aug 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
16 Mar 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Queensland Faculty of Medi, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Aaron R. Hansen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 3 2022
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Australia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 15 Mar 2012
PEAP - CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 16 Mar 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2015 to 15 Mar 2015
CF - Medical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jan 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Mar 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Mar 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 16 Mar 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Nov 2021 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 09 Aug 2022 |