THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 19:59:37 PM
Gardner, Richard Oliver Exton
CPSO#:
97227
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Sep 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
04 Sep 2023
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: University of London, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Esigodini Road
CURE Children's Hospital of Zimbabw
Bulawayo
Zimbabwe
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:01 Sep 2023 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2012 to 24 Apr 2012
PEAP - CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 25 Apr 2012 to 31 Jan 2013
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Feb 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Apr 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jan 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 Sep 2023 |
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Expiry Date: 31 Aug 2030 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Sep 2023 |
|
Active |