THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 17:44:55 PM
Gwyn, Alice Bond Jermy
CPSO#:
97226
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Aug 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Aug 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Spanish
Education: Queen's University Belfast School of Med, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Northern Appointment Clinic
4 Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout ON P8T 1K8
Phone: (807) 737-5182
Fax: 8077372994
Electoral District: 09
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:79 Fifth Avenue
Sioux Lookout, ON P8T 1K9
Date Received: 16 May 2014
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre |
Sioux Lookout |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:27 Jun 2007 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALICE BOND JERMY GWYN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GWYN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jan 2012 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Aug 2016 |