THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 13:52:35 PM
Abu-Rashed, Kamal Ahmad
CPSO#:
97221
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Jan 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
20 Jan 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: St.Christopher Iba Mar Diop Col of Med, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
101 Erie Street East
Windsor ON N9A 3W9
Phone: (519) 254-2999
Fax: (519) 254-4999
Electoral District: 01
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Erie Shores HealthCare |
Leamington |
Windsor Regional Hospital |
Windsor |
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:20 Jan 2012 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 20 Jan 2012 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Jan 2012 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 19 Jul 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Jun 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Aug 2013 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 01 Aug 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Jun 2019 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Mar 2021 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Mar 2021 |
|
Active |