THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 5:16:09 AM
Naser, Mohamed Sadiq Mohamed
CPSO#:
97198
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Oct 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Oct 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Peshawar, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Blvd.
Cambridge ON N1R 3G2
Phone: (519) 621-2330
Fax: (519) 629-3801
Electoral District: 03
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:01 Jun 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nephrology |
Effective:01 Jun 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MOHAMED SADIQ MOHAMED NASER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NASER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2012 to 24 Apr 2012
PEAP - CF - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 25 Apr 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jan 2014
CF - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jan 2015
CF - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Nov 2015
CF - Nephrology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Feb 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Apr 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Nov 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Oct 2017 |