THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 10:34:04 AM
Laba-Kaczmarek, Jessica Anne
CPSO#:
97190
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Dec 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Dec 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
32 Munger Avenue West
Harrow ON N0R 1G0
Phone: (519) 738-3555
Fax: (519) 738-3990
Electoral District: 01
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Georgia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Erie Shores HealthCare |
Leamington |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:24 Aug 2018 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JESSICA ANNE LABA-KACZMAREK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LABA-KACZMAREK is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 11 Jan 2012 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Jan 2012 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 10 Jul 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 23 May 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Sep 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Oct 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Sep 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Nov 2014 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 17 Nov 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Dec 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Dec 2018 |