THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 19:52:10 PM
Stammers, David Michael
CPSO#:
97184
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
26 Jul 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
11 Sep 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Pediatric Hematology/Oncology |
Effective:27 Sep 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 12 Jan 2012 to 08 Feb 2012
EL - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jan 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 08 Feb 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Sep 2015 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 26 Jul 2017 |