THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 19:19:25 PM
Usmani, Yasmine Ilona
CPSO#:
97181
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Jul 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Mar 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Reproductive Care Centre
2180 Meadowvale Blvd
Mississauga ON L5N 5S3
Phone: (905) 816-9822
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre |
Toronto |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:30 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility |
Effective:26 Sep 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. YASMINE ILONA USMANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. USMANI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 03 Jan 2012 to 30 Jan 2012
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 25 Nov 2013 to 15 Dec 2013
EL - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
McMaster University, 16 Dec 2013 to 09 Mar 2014
EL - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 10 Mar 2014 to 30 Mar 2014
EL - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
University of Toronto, 31 Mar 2014 to 11 Apr 2014
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 06 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 19 Jan 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 20 Jan 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2017 to 23 Mar 2018
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jan 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jan 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Nov 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 09 Mar 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Mar 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Apr 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 2015 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Mar 2018 |